Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 18:30:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DAVIS, FINNEGAN

Case Summary

On 07/28/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, FINNEGAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************39 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAVIS, FINNEGAN

Sarasota, FL 34239

Not Yet Classified

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

01/22/2020: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

COPY OF CHECK FROM DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

10/23/2019: COPY OF CHECK FROM DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

COPY OF CHECK FROM DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

09/17/2019: COPY OF CHECK FROM DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION CONTRACT

01/15/2019: PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION CONTRACT

COURT ACTION MEMO

01/15/2019: COURT ACTION MEMO

COURT ACTION MEMO

12/19/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

12/19/2018: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

11/13/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

11/13/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

09/27/2018: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

09/25/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

09/24/2018: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

08/10/2018: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

08/03/2018: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

08/03/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

07/30/2018: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

07/28/2018: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ARREST FORM

07/28/2018: ARREST FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeLARC: GRAND THEFT 300 LESS THAN 5K DOLS; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPARTY CHARGE DISPOSITION ENTRY; Chg No: 1 Citation #: ; Degree of Offense: Third Degree Felony; Date of Offense Begin: 07/28/2018 End: ; Final Plea: Nolo Contendere 01/15/2019; Court Action: Pre-Trial Diversion 01/15/2019; Disp. Jdg: PENA, PHILLIP A; Division Nbr.: PP2 Jurisdiction Retained: ; Trial Type: None - No Trial; Defr. Sentence: No; Fines/Costs: No; Court Charge Status: Same; Court Action Code: 812.014(2)(C)(1); Description: LARC: GRAND THEFT 300 LESS THAN 5K DOLS; Degree of Offense: Third Degree Felony; Offense Activity: Not Applicable; Gen Off Character: Principal; Drug Type: Not Applicable; Pty Chg Disp: 01/15/2019 Pre-Trial Diversion; Pty Chg Disp: 09/24/2018 Filed; Pty Chg Disp: 01/22/2020 Dropped/Abandoned; License Surrendered: No;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Final Decision Date: 01/22/2020; Final Action: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 208003; Paid: $68.02; Applied: $68.02; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK FROM DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 206690; Paid: $902.98; Applied: $281.98; Refunded: $621.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK FROM DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HearingChange of Plea; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $350.00; Total Fee Paid: $350.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE