Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/21/2021 at 15:41:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DAVIS, ANTHONY DEVON

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, ANTHONY DEVON. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************07 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAVIS, ANTHONY DEVON

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

BAKER, TYRONE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FLYNN, CONOR P

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND

06/17/2021: SURETY BOND

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/16/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/16/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/16/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/16/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/16/2021: ARREST FORM

Bench Warrant Issued

06/07/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

06/07/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 06/15/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/16/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021BB003006 ; Bond Amount: $10000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Power Number: 2021BB003006; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 06/15/2021 for: DAVIS, ANTHONY DEVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 06/07/2021 ; For: DAVIS, ANTHONY DEVON ; Bond Amt: 50000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C