This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/25/2021 at 09:08:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- DARLING, JOSEPH KELLEY

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DARLING, JOSEPH KELLEY. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************85 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

DARLING, JOSEPH KELLEY

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued (Do not delete)

07/09/2021: Summons Issued (Do not delete)

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

07/02/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketIssue Date: 07/08/2021; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; DARLING, JOSEPH KELLEY; 3055 NE 28TH DR; GAINESVILLE, FL 32609; Tracking No: L000069399; ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking # L000069399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargePETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 07/02/2021; Final Decision Date: 07/02/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLUGH, STEPHANIE B