This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/24/2021 at 09:20:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- CURRY, DETRION EUGENE

Case Summary

On 06/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CURRY, DETRION EUGENE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************96 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

CURRY, DETRION EUGENE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SARAFAN, DANIEL

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

SCHMIDT, SCOTT T

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLUGH, STEPHANIE B

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COURT ACTION MINUTES

07/29/2021: COURT ACTION MINUTES

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

INFORMATION FILED

06/24/2021: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/22/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/19/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/19/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingPre-Trial Conference; Judge: JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Pre-Trial Conference ; Date: 09/23/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 07/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-A; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeRESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 06/24/2021; Final Decision Date: 06/24/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLUGH, STEPHANIE B