This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/13/2020 at 03:41:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- CORBESERO, CHERYL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CORBESERO, CHERYL. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************33 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

Judge Details

Judge

JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

CORBESERO, CHERYL

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32602

RAINONE, MATTHEW

Chiefland, FL 32626

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT OF REFUND CHECK

09/17/2019: RECEIPT OF REFUND CHECK

UNCLAIMED MONEY WORKSHEET

09/11/2019: UNCLAIMED MONEY WORKSHEET

CASH BOND RELEASE MEMORANDUM

08/27/2019: CASH BOND RELEASE MEMORANDUM

COPY OF CHECK & STUB

08/26/2019: COPY OF CHECK & STUB

CASH APPEARANCE BOND (OUT OF COUNTY - GILCHRIST COUNTY)

08/26/2019: CASH APPEARANCE BOND (OUT OF COUNTY - GILCHRIST COUNTY)

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

08/15/2019: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

COURT ACTION MINUTES

08/06/2019: COURT ACTION MINUTES

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

08/06/2019: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

07/24/2019: OUT-OF-COUNTY ARREST FORM

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

07/17/2019: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

OUT OF COUNTY BOND OUT INFORMATION - FILED BY ASO

07/15/2019: OUT OF COUNTY BOND OUT INFORMATION - FILED BY ASO

LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE (RECEIVED/REVIEWED BY COURT)

10/17/2018: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE (RECEIVED/REVIEWED BY COURT)

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH CAPIAS

10/17/2018: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH CAPIAS

Capias Issued (Do not delete)

10/02/2018: Capias Issued (Do not delete)

COURT ACTION MINUTES

10/02/2018: COURT ACTION MINUTES

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

09/07/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

ORDER QUASHING CAPIAS // JAWORSKI

09/06/2018: ORDER QUASHING CAPIAS // JAWORSKI

NOTICE RETURNED NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

09/04/2018: NOTICE RETURNED NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF REFUND CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT CRIMINAL UNCLAIMED / CASH BOND PAYMENT REISSUE / DEPOSITOR PICK UP # 131080; Amount: $276.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 206434; Paid: $276.00; Applied: $276.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNCLAIMED MONEY WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CRIMINAL UNCLAIMED PROPERTY Receipt: 206434 Date: 09/11/2019; Amount: $276.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT CRIMINAL OPEN BOND # 131080 Voided on 09/11/2019. Returned undeliverable. Moved to Unclaimed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND RELEASE MEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $276.00; Power Number: 131080; Bond Status: Released; Cash Depositor: RAINONE, MATTHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 206072; Paid: $276.00; Applied: $276.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 131080 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: FRAUD-INSUFF FUNDS CHECK: MAKE UTTER ISSUE UNDER 1 ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: FRAUD-INSUFF FUNDS CHECK: MAKE UTTER ISSUE UNDER 1 ; Bonding Co.: ; Bond Amount: $276 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 08/26/2019 ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED UNEXECUTED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCRIMINAL SUMMONS RECALLED; Return Date : 07/16/2018 Reason : SUMMONS RECALLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketIssue Date: 05/04/2018; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; CORBESERO, CHERYL; 1505 FORT CLARKE BLVD APT 10-308; GAINESVILLE, FL 32606; Tracking No: L000065998; ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking # L000065998; Failure Date: 07/16/2018; Result of Service: SUMMONS RECALLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 05/03/2018; Final Decision Date: 05/03/2018; Final Action: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketWORTHLESS CHECK AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $552.00; Total Fee Paid: $552.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW