This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/20/2021 at 08:52:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- COOK, SHIRLEY ANN

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COOK, SHIRLEY ANN. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************00 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

COOK, SHIRLEY ANN

Gainesville, FL 32641

DIXON, SHIRLEY

Gainesville, FL 32641

DANIELS, SHIRLEY ANN

Gainesville, FL 32641

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHMIDT, SCOTT T

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

CHECK STUB

07/20/2021: CHECK STUB

CASH BOND RELEASE MEMORANDUM

07/16/2021: CASH BOND RELEASE MEMORANDUM

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

05/25/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

05/05/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/03/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/30/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/30/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/30/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/30/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/30/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK STUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT CRIMINAL OPEN BOND # 210430MM000800A1 APPLY TO 2019 MM 002569 A; Amount: $99.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND RELEASE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC); Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $99.00; Power Number: 210430MM000800A1; Bond Status: Released; Cash Depositor: COOK, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/25/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 210430MM000800A1 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: BATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC) ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: ; Bond Amount: $99 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 05/25/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $99.00; Power Number: 210430MM000800A1; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: COOK, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 225155; Paid: $99.00; Applied: $99.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $149.00; Total Fee Paid: $99.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - MM $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE