This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 14:01:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- COCKRELL, WILLIE LLOYD

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COCKRELL, WILLIE LLOYD. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************07 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

COCKRELL, WILLIE LLOYD

North Little Rock, AR 72114

Not Yet Classified

PETERSON, MARC

Gainesville, FL 32602

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN, AUBRONCEE

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

PETERSON, MARC

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/08/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/07/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

09/03/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

09/03/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

09/03/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON, MARC