Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 20:21:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- COBB, ROBERT LEE

Case Summary

On 07/23/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COBB, ROBERT LEE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, WILLIAM E and PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************25 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendants

COBB, ROBERT LEE

Gainesville, FL 32609

COBB, ROBERT JAMES

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

09/15/2017: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/15/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE (ROR)

09/15/2017: MOTION FOR RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE (ROR)

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

08/24/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

08/15/2017: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/15/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

08/07/2017: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/07/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

08/04/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

07/23/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

07/23/2017: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • ChargePOSSESSION OF WEAPON: OR AMMO BY CONVICTED FLA FEL; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO INFO LACKS PROSECUTIVE MERIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 09/15/2017; Final Action: B2 NO INFO LACKS PROSECUTIVE MERIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE (ROR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 09/18/2017 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-E; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 08/15/2017 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HECHAVARRIA, OMAR