This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/25/2021 at 09:24:07 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- CLARK, SHARON YVONNE

Case Summary

On 06/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLARK, SHARON YVONNE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************63 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendants

CLARK, SHARON YVONNE

Gainesville, FL 32601

CLARK, YVONNE SHARON

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FLYNN, CONOR P

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON REPORT OF VIOLATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE//KREIDER

08/11/2021: ORDER ON REPORT OF VIOLATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE//KREIDER

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF PRETRIAL SUPERVISION

08/06/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF PRETRIAL SUPERVISION

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/26/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

07/22/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/12/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/08/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/21/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

06/21/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/20/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/20/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/20/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REPORT OF VIOLATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE//KREIDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF VIOLATION OF PRETRIAL SUPERVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 09/14/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 07/27/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S