Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 15:07:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- CASTILLO, CHRISTOPHER DALE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CASTILLO, CHRISTOPHER DALE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************73 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

CASTILLO, CHRISTOPHER DALE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

COUNSEL, REGIONAL

235 South Main St., Suite 205

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

04/13/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/13/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

04/12/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/02/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/01/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/01/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/01/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J