Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:11:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- CASTILLO, CHRISTOPHER DALE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CASTILLO, CHRISTOPHER DALE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************36 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

CASTILLO, CHRISTOPHER DALE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

BROLING, JOHN L

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

04/12/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/12/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/12/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/05/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/22/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/22/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/22/2021: ARREST FORM

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROLING, JOHN L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J