Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/27/2021 at 11:13:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- CARPENTER, KAYLA LASHAY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARPENTER, KAYLA LASHAY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************10 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

CARPENTER, KAYLA LASHAY

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

PRINCE, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

PRINCE, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

06/15/2021: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/15/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/04/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

05/20/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

05/14/2021: INFORMATION FILED

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // KREIDER

04/20/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // KREIDER

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/20/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

ORDER OF NON-ACCEPTANCE TO MENTAL HEALTH COURT

04/19/2021: ORDER OF NON-ACCEPTANCE TO MENTAL HEALTH COURT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/19/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

REPORT OF MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION

04/19/2021: REPORT OF MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/14/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/13/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/13/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/13/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/13/2021: ARREST FORM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 07/13/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 06/15/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • ChargeRESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • ChargeVEH THEFT: GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEHICLE; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 04/20/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE, BRITANEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE