Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/13/2020 at 22:42:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BUGGS, PATRICIA DIANE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BUGGS, PATRICIA DIANE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************86 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.

 

Party Details

Defendants

BUGGS, PATRICIA DIANE

Gainesville, FL 32641

BOGGS, PARTICIA DIAN

Gainesville, FL 32641

BUGGS, PATRICIA

Gainesville, FL 32641

MOSLEY, PATRICIA

Gainesville, FL 32641

DOE, JANE

Gainesville, FL 32641

BUGGS, PATRICIA DIANA

Gainesville, FL 32641

BUGGS-WILLIAMS, PATRICIA DIANE

Gainesville, FL 32641

WILLIAMS, LATRICIA

Gainesville, FL 32641

WALKER, JENNIFER ELANE

Gainesville, FL 32641

WILLIAMS, PATRICIA DIANE

Gainesville, FL 32641

BIGGS, PATRICIA D.

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

07/05/2018: INFORMATION FILED

RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS

06/29/2018: RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/26/2018: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Summons Issued (Do not delete)

06/20/2018: Summons Issued (Do not delete)

COPY OF INFORMATION SHOWING CASE NUMBER

06/20/2018: COPY OF INFORMATION SHOWING CASE NUMBER

INFORMATION FILED

06/20/2018: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/13/2018: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

06/04/2018: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2018 CF 002373 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • ChargeLARC: PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE 100 LESS 300 DOLS; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketTransferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 07/17/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-A; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED SERVED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; INITIAL PHASE; Arrest/Summons Served Date: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED; Return Date : 06/28/2018 Reason : SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF INFORMATION SHOWING CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketIssue Date: 06/20/2018; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; BUGGS, PATRICIA DIANE; 3501 NE 15TH ST M103; GAINESVILLE, FL 32641; Tracking No: L000066111; ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Docket-012018CF1903A TRANSFERRED INTO THIS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking # L000066111; Failure Date: 06/28/2018; Result of Service: SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 06/19/2018; Final Decision Date: 06/19/2018; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY, JONATHAN D