This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 15:02:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BROWN SR., JEREMIAH HOSEA

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN SR , JEREMIAH HOSEA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************34 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

BROWN SR., JEREMIAH HOSEA

Gainesville, FL 32608

BROWN, JEREMIAH HOSE

Gainesville, FL 32608

BROWN, JEREMIAH JOSE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GARDINER, EVAN M

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/07/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

09/02/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

09/02/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

09/02/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

09/02/2021: ARREST FORM

Bench Warrant Issued

08/26/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

08/26/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 09/01/2021 for: BROWN SR, JEREMIAH HOSEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 08/26/2021 ; For: BROWN SR, JEREMIAH HOSEA ; Bond Amt: 120000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C