This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/20/2021 at 07:33:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BROWN, DEVARON CARTRELL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN, DEVARON CARTRELL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************42 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

BROWN, DEVARON CARTRELL

Newberry, FL 32669

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

BROLING, JOHN L

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

08/11/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

05/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

05/17/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

05/14/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

05/14/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/14/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/29/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

04/29/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/28/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/28/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/28/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-SELL: SALE OF SYNTHETIC CANNABINOIDS; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 08/11/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S