This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 10/31/2021 at 15:02:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BRADY III, GILBERT WAYNE

Case Summary

On 10/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRADY III, GILBERT WAYNE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************06 A

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

BRADY 3, GILBERT WAYNE

BRADY III, GILBERT WAYNE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GARDINER, EVAN M

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

BUZAN ESQUIRE, RICHARD

309 Ne 1St Street Suite 15

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

10/27/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD ON STIPULATION

10/25/2021: ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD ON STIPULATION

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/25/2021: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

10/19/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

10/19/2021: PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

10/19/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/18/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

10/17/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

10/17/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERFSTE

10/17/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERFSTE

ARREST FORM

10/17/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD ON STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERFSTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C