This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:32:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BOYD, KEVIN MARCUS

Case Summary

On 06/20/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOYD, KEVIN MARCUS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************68 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

BOYD, KEVIN MARCUS

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

AFDIV, ALACHUA

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JONES ESQ, CHRISTOPHER

4545 Nw 8Th Ave Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32605

MARTIN, AUBRONCEE

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AFDIV, ALACHUA

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

08/17/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD ON STIPULATION

08/13/2021: ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD ON STIPULATION

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/12/2021: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

08/12/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

08/12/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/10/2021: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

08/10/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/10/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

08/05/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

07/28/2021: INFORMATION FILED

COURT ACTION MEMO

07/20/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

07/20/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

AMENDED FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER AS TO VICTIM NAMES- NUNC PRO TUNC 06/20/2021

06/25/2021: AMENDED FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER AS TO VICTIM NAMES- NUNC PRO TUNC 06/20/2021

MEMO FROM CLERK TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

06/25/2021: MEMO FROM CLERK TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/21/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/20/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/20/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD ON STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; ; The following event: Case Management scheduled for 09/21/2021 at 2:00 pm has been rescheduled as follows:; ; Event: Case Management ; Date: 09/21/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 09/21/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-B; ; Result: RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingChange of Plea; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO FROM CLERK TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUALEHI, ZOUZOUKO S