This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/20/2021 at 09:12:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BENNETT, JANISE CAMILLE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BENNETT, JANISE CAMILLE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************30 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

BENNETT, JANISE CAMILLE

Archer, FL 32618

Not Yet Classified

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHMIDT, SCOTT T

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

05/21/2021: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/06/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/05/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

05/04/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

05/03/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

05/03/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

05/03/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

05/03/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC); Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/21/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - MM $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE