This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:32:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BENJAMIN, KYA MOESHA

Case Summary

On 06/20/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BENJAMIN, KYA MOESHA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, WALTER M and KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************73 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, WALTER M

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Defendant

BENJAMIN, KYA MOESHA

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BROLING, JOHN L

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

08/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

08/23/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE WITH SPECIFIED CONDITIONS

08/20/2021: ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE WITH SPECIFIED CONDITIONS

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

08/20/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

CONSENT TO DRUG COURT PROTOCOL OF SANCTIONS

08/20/2021: CONSENT TO DRUG COURT PROTOCOL OF SANCTIONS

DRUG COURT ELIGIBILITY QUESTIONNAIRE

08/20/2021: DRUG COURT ELIGIBILITY QUESTIONNAIRE

DRUG COURT COVENANT AND AGREEMENT

08/20/2021: DRUG COURT COVENANT AND AGREEMENT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

08/06/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

INFORMATION FILED

07/23/2021: INFORMATION FILED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

07/13/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

07/12/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

06/29/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

06/29/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

06/22/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/21/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/21/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/21/2021: ARREST FORM

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOBTS POST-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; RE-ARREST PHASE; OBTS Number: 0108048127; Re-Arrest Date: 08/22/2021; Officer Agency: ALACHUA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Charge Code: FTA (No Bond)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; ORDER OF ARREST served on: 08/22/2021 for: BENJAMIN, KYA MOESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; ORDER OF ARREST served on: 08/22/2021 for: BENJAMIN, KYA MOESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE WITH SPECIFIED CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKENS, KRISTIN S