This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/19/2021 at 08:56:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BATTEN, JUSTIN KEYONTA

Case Summary

On 05/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BATTEN, JUSTIN KEYONTA. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************22 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

BATTEN, JUSTIN KEYONTA

Gainesville, FL 32605

Not Yet Classified

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

Gainesville, FL 32602

SHIP, WYNETTA

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SARAFAN, DANIEL

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO CASH BOND AGENT

08/02/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO CASH BOND AGENT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

07/29/2021: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

NOTICE ISSUED TO CASH BOND AGENT

07/22/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO CASH BOND AGENT

CASH APPEARANCE BOND

07/21/2021: CASH APPEARANCE BOND

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/20/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INDIGENCY APPLICATION - FOUND INDIGENT BY COURT

07/13/2021: INDIGENCY APPLICATION - FOUND INDIGENT BY COURT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

07/13/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

07/13/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ARREST FORM

07/13/2021: ARREST FORM

Capias Issued (Do not delete)

07/02/2021: Capias Issued (Do not delete)

COURT ACTION MINUTES

07/01/2021: COURT ACTION MINUTES

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

06/04/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

05/26/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/06/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

05/04/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

05/03/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

05/03/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

05/03/2021: ARREST FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • HearingPre-Trial Conference; Judge: JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO CASH BOND AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Pre-Trial Conference ; Date: 08/19/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 1 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: JAWORSKI, THOMAS M.; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO CASH BOND AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Amount: $99.00; Power Number: 210713MM000822A1; Bond Status: Open; Cash Depositor: SHIP, WYNETTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 227293; Paid: $99.00; Applied: $99.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMM CRME OPEN CASH BOND PLACED IN HOLDING ACCT Receipt: 227293 Date: 07/21/2021; Amount: $99.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • ChargeDAMAGE PROP-CRIM MISCH: 200 DOLS AND UNDER; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 05/26/2021; Final Decision Date: 05/26/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $149.00; Total Fee Paid: $99.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE