This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 01/30/2022 at 16:00:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BARTON, ROBERT KENNETH

Case Summary

On 01/02/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARTON, ROBERT KENNETH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************10 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

BARTON, ROBERT KENNETH

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

GORDON, PAMELA C

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIANNASOLI, ALEXIS J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GORDON, PAMELA C

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

01/03/2022: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/03/2022: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/04/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/06/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, PAMELA C