Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 14:20:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BARNETT JR, JERRY G

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARNETT JR, JERRY G. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************47 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendants

BARNETT JR, JERRY G

Trenton, FL 32693

BARNETT, JERRY GREGORY

Trenton, FL 32693

Not Yet Classified

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS, LOGAN M

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

03/26/2019: CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $200.00 TO ALACHUA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE // PENA

03/12/2019: CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $200.00 TO ALACHUA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE // PENA

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED (VOP)// PENA

03/12/2019: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED (VOP)// PENA

SCORE SHEET

03/12/2019: SCORE SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

02/22/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/21/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

AMENDED VOP Warrant Issued

01/30/2019: AMENDED VOP Warrant Issued

AFFIDAVIT - VIOLATION OF PROBATION

01/29/2019: AFFIDAVIT - VIOLATION OF PROBATION

VIOLATION REPORT - REQUEST FOR WARRANT

01/29/2019: VIOLATION REPORT - REQUEST FOR WARRANT

ORDER OF PROBATION// PENA

10/26/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION// PENA

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS //PENA

10/24/2018: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS //PENA

SCORE SHEET

10/24/2018: SCORE SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

10/07/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

07/25/2018: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

07/16/2018: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/16/2018: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

07/16/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

07/03/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $921.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES -$921.00 SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//JMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//hap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • HearingArraignment for VOP; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF ATTORNEY FEES; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF STATE ATTY COST OF PROSECUTION; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • DocketALERT SERVED; Capias served on: 06/30/2018 for: BARNETT JR, JERRY G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapias Issued (Do not delete)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; Capias issued on: 04/16/2018 ; For: BARNETT JR, JERRY G ; Bond Amt: 25000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 04/09/2018; Final Decision Date: 04/09/2018; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $921.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $921.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less