This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:29:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- BALL, ELI ISRAEL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BALL, ELI ISRAEL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************84 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

BALL, ELI ISRAEL

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN, AUBRONCEE

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAUSLAND, BRITANEE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

CLAUDE SCREWS, ARIELLE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

05/19/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

04/12/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/11/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/11/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/11/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2021 MM 000977 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • ChargeKIDNAP-FALSE IMPRISONMENT: ADULT; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC); Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/19/2021; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN, AUBRONCEE