Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 00:17:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ARGUELLO, ALEX ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 06/09/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ARGUELLO, ALEX ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************73 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

ARGUELLO, ALEX ENRIQUE

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COPY OF RECEIPT

12/21/2018: COPY OF RECEIPT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK

12/20/2018: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PERFORM COMMUNITY SERVICE IN LIEU OF PAYING CRIMINAL COURT COSTS

12/19/2018: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PERFORM COMMUNITY SERVICE IN LIEU OF PAYING CRIMINAL COURT COSTS

LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

12/12/2018: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

MEMO TO COURT FROM COURT SERVICES

09/27/2018: MEMO TO COURT FROM COURT SERVICES

RETURNED MAIL:RETURN TO SENDER; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD

09/17/2018: RETURNED MAIL:RETURN TO SENDER; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD

CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

09/07/2018: CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

RESTITUTION ORDER - RESTITUTION NOT ORDERED// PENA

08/21/2018: RESTITUTION ORDER - RESTITUTION NOT ORDERED// PENA

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

08/21/2018: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT // PENA

08/21/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT // PENA

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/21/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

08/14/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/14/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/02/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/19/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/18/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/12/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/09/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $583.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 198249; Paid: $50.00; Applied: $50.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF/ZZ $5 PARTIAL PAYMENT FEE Receipt: 198249 Date: 01/25/2019; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 197051; Paid: $47.38; Applied: $47.38; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF/ZZ $5 PARTIAL PAYMENT FEE Receipt: 197051 Date: 12/21/2018; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketMAY PERFORM HOURS IN LIEU OF COSTS AT RATE OF $8.25 PER HOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE Receipt: 197051 Date: 12/21/2018 Receipt: 198249 Date: 01/25/2019; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $681.00; Total Fee Paid: $97.38; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $583.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2018
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2018
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLER, DANIELLE BROOME