Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 14:26:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ALSOP, DAVID E

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALSOP, DAVID E. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PENA, PHILLIP A and FERRERO, DENISE R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************88 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PENA, PHILLIP A

FERRERO, DENISE R

 

Party Details

Defendant

ALSOP, DAVID E

Ocala, FL 34480

Not Yet Classified

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

STACY, HOLLY R

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ALACHUA COUNTY FDLE FIREARM REPORT - MENTAL HEALTH ORDERS

02/25/2019: ALACHUA COUNTY FDLE FIREARM REPORT - MENTAL HEALTH ORDERS

ORDER OF CONTINUING COMMITMENT [MENTAL ILLNESS]

02/20/2019: ORDER OF CONTINUING COMMITMENT [MENTAL ILLNESS]

COURT ACTION MEMO

02/21/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/19/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COURT ACTION MEMO

09/20/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

COURT ACTION MEMO

09/06/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

STIPULATION OF EVIDENCE

08/24/2017: STIPULATION OF EVIDENCE

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/23/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

08/23/2017: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/31/2017: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT(S) FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION // PENA

07/28/2017: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT(S) FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION // PENA

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/28/2017: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

07/27/2017: INFORMATION FILED

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EXPERT ADVISOR

07/24/2017: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EXPERT ADVISOR

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

07/11/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

07/10/2017: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

07/07/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ARREST FORM

07/07/2017: ARREST FORM

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingFELONY FORENSICS; Judge: FERRERO, DENISE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALACHUA COUNTY FDLE FIREARM REPORT - MENTAL HEALTH ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • HearingFELONY FORENSICS; Judge: FERRERO, DENISE R; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUING COMMITMENT [MENTAL ILLNESS]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: FELONY FORENSICS ; Date: 02/19/2020 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 5 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketPSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALACHUA COUNTY FDLE FIREARM REPORT - MENTAL HEALTH ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKENS, KRISTIN S