Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 16:31:57 (UTC).

YES PALMS OF ARCHER LLC -vs- BRYD, BRITTANY SHANAY et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 YES PALMS OF ARCHER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRYD, BRITTANY SHANAY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0954

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YES PALMS OF ARCHER LLC

THE PALMS OF ARCHER

Defendants

BRYD, BRITTANY SHANAY

Gainesville, FL 32608

KNIGHTON II, DAVID SAMUEL

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TONUZI ESQ, MATTHEW

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

04/08/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/06/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) CLERKS NOTE: LAST NAME ON ENVELOPE IS DIFFERENT THAN NAME ON COMPLAINT; DAVID SAMUEL KNIGHTON II (DEFENDANT);

03/23/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) CLERKS NOTE: LAST NAME ON ENVELOPE IS DIFFERENT THAN NAME ON COMPLAINT; DAVID SAMUEL KNIGHTON II (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT); BRITTANY SHANAY BRYD (DEFENDANT);

03/23/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT); BRITTANY SHANAY BRYD (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; DAVID SAMUEL KNIGHTON II (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; DAVID SAMUEL KNIGHTON II (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; BRITTANY SHANAY BYRD (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; BRITTANY SHANAY BYRD (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/17/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/17/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) CLERKS NOTE: LAST NAME ON ENVELOPE IS DIFFERENT THAN NAME ON COMPLAINT; DAVID SAMUEL KNIGHTON II (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT); BRITTANY SHANAY BRYD (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467495; Paid: $205.00; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $205.00; Total Fee Paid: $205.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; DAVID SAMUEL KNIGHTON II (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; BRITTANY SHANAY BYRD (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 467495 Date: 03/18/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YES PALMS OF ARCHER LLC is a litigant