This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 23:58:54 (UTC).

YES COMPANIES FRED LLC -vs- BATTISTA, TONYA L et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 YES COMPANIES FRED LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BATTISTA, TONYA L. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3235

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YES COMPANIES FRED LLC

HIDDEN OAKS

Defendants

BATTISTA, TONYA L

Gainesville, FL 32607

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

BATTISTA, TONYA

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELEFANT ESQ, FRED

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, Po Box 5727

Jacksonville, FL 32247

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 408859 Date: 10/12/2017; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/12/2017: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 408859 Date: 10/12/2017; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

10/12/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE AS TO: TONYA L. BATTISTA AKA TONYA BATTISTA Receipt: 408859 Date: 10/12/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/12/2017: 5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE AS TO: TONYA L. BATTISTA AKA TONYA BATTISTA Receipt: 408859 Date: 10/12/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/16/2017: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS- POSTED 10/17/2017 AS TO: TONYA L BATTISTA AKA TONYA BATTISTA

10/18/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS- POSTED 10/17/2017 AS TO: TONYA L BATTISTA AKA TONYA BATTISTA

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, NON-----MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND PROOF OF CLAIM

10/26/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, NON-----MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND PROOF OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (EVICTION) & DEFAULT ENTERED 10/26/2017/CMW; AS TO: TONYA L. BATTISTA A/K/A TONYA BATTISTA

10/26/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (EVICTION) & DEFAULT ENTERED 10/26/2017/CMW; AS TO: TONYA L. BATTISTA A/K/A TONYA BATTISTA

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION (CLOSES)

10/30/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION (CLOSES)

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 10/31/17

10/31/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 10/31/17

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

11/07/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

MAIL RETURNED; TONYA L BATTISTA

12/04/2017: MAIL RETURNED; TONYA L BATTISTA

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; TONYA L BATTISTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 10/31/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/12/2017; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT (EVICTION) & DEFAULT ENTERED 10/26/2017/CMW; AS TO: TONYA L. BATTISTA A/K/A TONYA BATTISTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, NON-----MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND PROOF OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS- POSTED 10/17/2017 AS TO: TONYA L BATTISTA AKA TONYA BATTISTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 408859; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE AS TO: TONYA L. BATTISTA AKA TONYA BATTISTA Receipt: 408859 Date: 10/12/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 408859 Date: 10/12/2017; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YES COMPANIES FRED, LLC D/B/A WOODLAND ESTATES is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL OTHERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elefant, Fred