Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:01:03 (UTC).

WOODS, JAVELL et al -VS- ROSS, LATARA

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 WOODS, JAVELL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROSS, LATARA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0784

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO

5719 Nw 13Th Street

Gainesville, FL 32653

WOODS, JAVELL

Newberry, FL 32669

Respondent

ROSS, LATARA

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEADORS ESQ., MICHAEL

500 E University Ave Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE ; PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 4/1/2021; LATARA ROSS (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketLETTER; ; Letter Returning Service Check; Sent on: 03/23/2021 12:57:06.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467622; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO LATARA ROSS; Receipt: 467622 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PATERNITY ACTION; (MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES 3/22/2021/CMW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF (DUPLICATE; CLERK USED WRONG DOCKET CODE WITHOUT THE $300.00 FILING FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY ; AND FOR RELATED RELIEF ; Receipt: 467622 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER PER F.S. 409.2563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEADORS ESQ., MICHAEL