Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:09:12 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, COREY T -VS- MCQUAY, IYA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 WILLIAMS, COREY T filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MCQUAY, IYA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0734

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Respondents and Petitioners

MCQUAY, IYA

Gainesville, FL 32608

WILLIAMS, COREY T

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

SMITH ESQ, JUDY-ANN

4465 Baymeadows Road Ste 3

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468314; Paid: $295.00; Applied: $295.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; IYA MCQUAY (COUNTER PETITIONER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT; IYA MCQUAY (COUNTER PETITIONER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; IYA MCQUAY (COUNTER PETITIONER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; IYA MCQUAY (COUNTER PETITIONER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMOTHER'S ANSWER TO FATHER'S PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND ; MOTHER'S COUNTER-PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF Receipt: 468314 Date: 04/07/2021; IYA MCQUAY (COUNTER PETITIONER);; Amount: $295.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 3/18/2021; IYA MCQUAY (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 03/17/2021 ; For: WILLIAMS, COREY T ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $605.00; Total Fee Paid: $295.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $310.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PATERNITY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE 28.241(1)(d) CIRCUIT CIVIL; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH ESQ, JUDY-ANN