This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 23:06:24 (UTC).

WEYERHAEUSER NR COMPANY -VS- CITY OF GAINESVILLE, FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 WEYERHAEUSER NR COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF GAINESVILLE, FLORIDA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0003

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

WEYERHAEUSER NR COMPANY

Appellee

CITY OF GAINESVILLE, FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

THERIAQUE ESQ., DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

06/03/2021: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI Receipt: 226051 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/03/2021: PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI Receipt: 226051 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

APPENDIX

06/03/2021: APPENDIX

LETTER ACKNOWLEDGING RECEIPT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

06/04/2021: LETTER ACKNOWLEDGING RECEIPT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

07/19/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AN AMENDED APPENDIX

08/18/2021: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AN AMENDED APPENDIX

ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AN AMMENDED APPENDIX

08/20/2021: ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AN AMMENDED APPENDIX

AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

09/02/2021: AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

AMENDED APPENDIX

09/02/2021: AMENDED APPENDIX

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/11/2021: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONDENT CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

11/10/2021: RESPONDENT CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

APPENDIX

11/12/2021: APPENDIX

REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT

12/06/2021: REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT

UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A SEVEN (7) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE REPLY

12/10/2021: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A SEVEN (7) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE REPLY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ; (PETITIONER SHALL FILE A REPLY ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2021)

12/14/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ; (PETITIONER SHALL FILE A REPLY ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2021)

PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

12/17/2021: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/17/2021

DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ; (PETITIONER SHALL FILE A REPLY ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2021

DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A SEVEN (7) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE REPLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A SEVEN (7) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE REPLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021

DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021

DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF RESPONDENT CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONDENT CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
08/18/2021

DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AN AMENDED APPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AN AMENDED APPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

FinancialReceipt # 226051; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER ACKNOWLEDGING RECEIPT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketCOURT ADVISED BY EMAIL OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021

FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI Receipt: 226051 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND AMENDED APPENDIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less