Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/03/2020 at 21:00:36 (UTC).

WELLS, DENISE -VS- SCHROEDER, APRIL LYNN et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 WELLS, DENISE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCHROEDER, APRIL LYNN. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1890

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS, DENISE

Defendants

SCHROEDER, APRIL LYNN

Gainesville, FL 32608

APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER AS PARENT AND NATURAL

Gainesville, FL 32608

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Chief Financial Officer, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUTLEDGE ESQUIRE, RANDALL

10 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/26/2017: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORY #13

10/25/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORY #13

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

10/25/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; AS TO DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; AS TO DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER

DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS(INDIVIDUALLY, AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER, MINOR) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/09/2017: DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS(INDIVIDUALLY, AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER, MINOR) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/28/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

09/28/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY

08/29/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY

DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER A MINOR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

07/27/2017: DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER A MINOR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER A MINOR NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/27/2017: DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER A MINOR NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT APRIL LYNNS SCHROEDERS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER A MINOR NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/27/2017: DEFENDANT APRIL LYNNS SCHROEDERS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF MADISON SCHROEDER A MINOR NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

07/27/2017: DEFENDANT APRIL LYNN SCHROEDERS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

LETTER

07/13/2017: LETTER

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER AS PARENT AND NATURAL (DEFENDANT);

07/06/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER AS PARENT AND NATURAL (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER (DEFENDANT);

07/06/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER (DEFENDANT);

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/27/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402603 Date: 05/30/2017; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/30/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402603 Date: 05/30/2017; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/26/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/26/2017; Disposition: B. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351(e)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWING ANY WAGE LOSS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORY #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 402603; Paid: $20.00; Applied: $20.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402603 Date: 05/30/2017; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402603 Date: 05/30/2017; APRIL LYNN SCHROEDER AS PARENT AND NATURAL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $440.00; Total Fee Paid: $440.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 402576; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402576 Date: 05/26/2017; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE MUTIPLE PARTIES ON SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 402576 Date: 05/26/2017; PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 402576 Date: 05/26/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rutledge, Randall