This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2022 at 16:03:30 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC -VS- JACKSON, SHARON

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACKSON, SHARON. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1897

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

JACKSON, SHARON

Gainesville, FL 32605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFRICANO ESQ, JOSEPH C

110 W Columbus Dr

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

DICKERSON ESQ, M JOSEPH

120 N Collins St Ste 201

Plant City, FL 33563

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) ; ; ; Receipt: 485862 Date: 05/31/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) ; ; ; Receipt: 485862 Date: 05/31/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ISSUED BY CLERK - SHARON JACKSON; ; ; ; ; ; Receipt: 485862 Date: 05/31/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2022: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ISSUED BY CLERK - SHARON JACKSON; ; ; ; ; ; Receipt: 485862 Date: 05/31/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/31/2022: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/31/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/07/2022: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(DUPLICATE) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/07/2022: (DUPLICATE) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

06/17/2022: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

06/17/2022: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

06/17/2022: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

06/17/2022: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2022: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(DUPLICATE) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 485862; Paid: 485862; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/29/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ISSUED BY CLERK - SHARON JACKSON; ; ; ; ; ; Receipt: 485862 Date: 05/31/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) ; ; ; Receipt: 485862 Date: 05/31/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M JOSEPH DICKERSON