This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 12/02/2021 at 16:00:59 (UTC).

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY -VS- AUGUSTE, IVENSON et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUGUSTE, IVENSON. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3823

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

EFFEREN, JOHN

Defendants

AUGUSTE, IVENSON

Boynton Beach, FL 33436

OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC

Registered Agent Phil Mavlonov, 1201 Dublin Rd Ste 515

Columbus, OH 43215

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ ESQ, RICHARD L

530 B St 8Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00

11/04/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00

11/04/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

11/04/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000); Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $300.00

11/04/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000); Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $300.00

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/03/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

11/03/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS CANNOT BE "TO" BOTH DEFENDANTS/ PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN STYLE OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/03/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS CANNOT BE "TO" BOTH DEFENDANTS/ PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN STYLE OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS CANNOT BE "TO" BOTH DEFENDANTS/ PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN STYLE OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/03/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS CANNOT BE "TO" BOTH DEFENDANTS/ PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN STYLE OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE; OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC (DEFENDANT);

11/05/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE; OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC (DEFENDANT);

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE; IVENSON AUGUSTE (DEFENDANT);

11/05/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE; IVENSON AUGUSTE (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC (DEFENDANT);

11/17/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/07/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 477240; Paid: $320.00; Applied: $320.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE; IVENSON AUGUSTE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE; OLD CITY EXPRESS LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $320.00; Total Fee Paid: $320.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS CANNOT BE "TO" BOTH DEFENDANTS/ PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN STYLE OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS CANNOT BE "TO" BOTH DEFENDANTS/ PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN STYLE OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $15000) Receipt: 477240 Date: 11/05/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.