Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/05/2020 at 20:41:50 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES -VS- CAPPA, DAVID A et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAPPA, DAVID A. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3252

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES

Defendants

PONIKVAR, APRYL

Gainesville, FL 32601

GEO-TECHNOLOGIES INC

Jonny Heath Ra, 1016 Se 3 Ave

Ocala, FL 34471

CAUSSEAUX HEWETT & WALPOLE INC

Rory P Causseaux Ra, 132 Nw 76 Dr

Gainesville, FL 32607

PONIKVAR & ASSOCIATES INC

Apryl W Ponikvar Ra, 720 Sw 2 Ave Suite 105

Gainesville, FL 32601

WALPOLE, ROBERT J

Gainesville, FL 32608

GIVENS, ROBERT WILLIAM

Jacksonville, FL 32257

PPI CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC

Robert P Butts Esq Ra, 5200 Sw 91 Terr Suite 101

Gainesville, FL 32608

CHARLES PERRY PARTNERS INC

Robert P Butts Esq Ra, Fisher Butts Sechrest & Warner Pa, 5200 Sw 91 Terr Suite 101

Gainesville, FL 32608

CAPPA, DAVID A

Ocala, FL 34471

STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS GROUP INC

Mark A Miller Ra, 4114 Sunbeam Rd Bldg 200

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLY ESQ, MAUREEN P

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 300 S Orange Ave Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

DANNECKER ESQ., JOHN H.

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

VRBENSKY ESQUIRE, JASON B

111 N Orange Ave Ste 950

Orlando, FL 32801

BEDARD ESQ, BENJAMIN L

470 Columbia Dr Bldg C101

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

MILLER ESQ, JUSTIN S

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33146

MALLARD ESQ, D SPENCER

1221 Brickell Ave 19 Fl

Miami, FL 33131

NOEY, R. DANIEL

2700-C University Blvd West

Jacksonville, FL 32217

TATE III ESQ, GEORGE W

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 390 N Orange Ave Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES); DAVID A CAPPA (DEFENDANT); GEO-TECHNOLOGIES INC (DEFENDANT);

06/10/2019: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES); DAVID A CAPPA (DEFENDANT); GEO-TECHNOLOGIES INC (DEFENDANT);

PLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GEO TECHNOLOGIES INCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIONY ASSERTING THAT JEANNE BERG PE USED FLAWED METHODS AND DATA

03/18/2019: PLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GEO TECHNOLOGIES INCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIONY ASSERTING THAT JEANNE BERG PE USED FLAWED METHODS AND DATA

DEFENDANT/CROSS PLAINTIFFS PONIKVAR & ASSOCIATED INC AND DEFENDANTS APRYL PONIKVAR OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS GEO TECHNOLOGIES INC AND DAVID A CAPPA EXHIBIT LIST

03/13/2019: DEFENDANT/CROSS PLAINTIFFS PONIKVAR & ASSOCIATED INC AND DEFENDANTS APRYL PONIKVAR OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS GEO TECHNOLOGIES INC AND DAVID A CAPPA EXHIBIT LIST

PRETRIAL STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF UNIVRSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES

03/13/2019: PRETRIAL STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF UNIVRSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES

NOTICE OF TAKING REBUTTAL DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

02/25/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING REBUTTAL DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JURY VIEW

02/25/2019: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JURY VIEW

PLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT CAUSSEAUX, HEWETT, & WALPOLE, INC'S INSURANCE INTERROAGTORIES

02/20/2019: PLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT CAUSSEAUX, HEWETT, & WALPOLE, INC'S INSURANCE INTERROAGTORIES

DEFENDANT GEO-TECHONOLOGIES INC AND DAVID A CAPPAS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

02/20/2019: DEFENDANT GEO-TECHONOLOGIES INC AND DAVID A CAPPAS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEFENDANTS PONIKVAR & ASSOCIATES INC AND APRYL PONNIKVAR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

02/20/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEFENDANTS PONIKVAR & ASSOCIATES INC AND APRYL PONNIKVAR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

DEFENDANTS CAUSSEAUX HEWETT & WALPOLE INC & ROBERT J WALPOLES EXHIBIT LIST

02/19/2019: DEFENDANTS CAUSSEAUX HEWETT & WALPOLE INC & ROBERT J WALPOLES EXHIBIT LIST

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF STRUCTURAL ENGINEER'S GROUP INC'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

10/26/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF STRUCTURAL ENGINEER'S GROUP INC'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

PLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT GEO TECHNOLOGIES INCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

06/27/2018: PLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT GEO TECHNOLOGIES INCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

06/15/2018: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

06/01/2018: ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, DAVID A CAPPA'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS GROUP INC

05/10/2018: DEFENDANT, DAVID A CAPPA'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS GROUP INC

PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO SEG DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/29/2017: PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO SEG DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PLAINTIFFS UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ROBERT J WALPOLE

11/14/2017: PLAINTIFFS UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ROBERT J WALPOLE

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; PPI CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/27/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; PPI CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

299 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DispositionNEG. - OTHER; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 09/27/2017; Disposition: A. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES); DAVID A CAPPA (DEFENDANT); GEO-TECHNOLOGIES INC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES); (AS TO DEFENDANT'S ONLY - DO NOT CLOSE); CAUSSEAUX HEWETT & WALPOLE INC (DEFENDANT); ROBERT WILLIAM GIVENS (DEFENDANT); PONIKVAR & ASSOCIATES INC (DEFENDANT); APRYL PONIKVAR (DEFENDANT); STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS GROUP INC (DEFENDANT); ROBERT J WALPOLE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEE' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS GEO-TECHNOLOGIES INC AND DAVID A CAPPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO GEO-TECH DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GEO TECHNOLOGIES INCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIONY ASSERTING THAT JEANNE BERG PE USED FLAWED METHODS AND DATA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGEO TECHNOLOGIES INC & DAVID A CAPPAS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
296 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; (UNABLE TO ISSUE; NOT AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; CHARLES PERRY PARTNERS INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS GROUP INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; (UNABLE TO ISSUE; NOT AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; PPI CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; (UNABLE TO ISSUE; NOT AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS Receipt: 408107 Date: 09/27/2017; Amount: $12.50; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN DANNECKER