This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/06/2022 at 09:32:23 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION -vs- BUCHANAN, ANDREW SHANE

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BUCHANAN, ANDREW SHANE. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4352

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

BUCHANAN, ANDREW SHANE

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUILES ESQ, MICHELLE

5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 478897 Date: 12/17/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/15/2021: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 478897 Date: 12/17/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

12/15/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ; Receipt: 478897 Date: 12/17/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/15/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ; Receipt: 478897 Date: 12/17/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/15/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/04/2022: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ANSWER IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); ANDREW SHANE BUCHANAN (DEFENDANT);

02/01/2022: ANSWER IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); ANDREW SHANE BUCHANAN (DEFENDANT);

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketANSWER IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); ANDREW SHANE BUCHANAN (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 478897; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ; Receipt: 478897 Date: 12/17/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 478897 Date: 12/17/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quiles, Michelle Maria