Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 16:05:55 (UTC).

TROY CAPITAL LLC -vs- MILES, BETTYE

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 TROY CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILES, BETTYE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2812

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROY CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

MILES, BETTYE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSMAN ESQ, RICHARD

4818 West Gandy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER(S)

01/12/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER(S)

FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF (CLOSES)

01/05/2018: FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF (CLOSES)

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/15/2017: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM (ATTACHED)

12/15/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM (ATTACHED)

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

12/15/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

(DUPLICATE) DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS A DEFAULT HAS ALREADY BEEN ENTERED; SEE DOCKET ENTRY BELOW - CMW 11/28/2017)

11/28/2017: (DUPLICATE) DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS A DEFAULT HAS ALREADY BEEN ENTERED; SEE DOCKET ENTRY BELOW - CMW 11/28/2017)

DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ENTERED 11/28/2017/CMW ; AS TO: BETTYE MILES

11/28/2017: DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ENTERED 11/28/2017/CMW ; AS TO: BETTYE MILES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT; (NO PROPOSED DEFAULT E-FILED WITH MOTION)

11/21/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT; (NO PROPOSED DEFAULT E-FILED WITH MOTION)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

11/21/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 10/3/2017

10/03/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 10/3/2017

MAIL RETURNED; BETTYE MILES

09/22/2017: MAIL RETURNED; BETTYE MILES

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/13/2017: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/05/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: BETTYE MILES; Receipt: 407203 Date: 09/05/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/05/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: BETTYE MILES; Receipt: 407203 Date: 09/05/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/05/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

09/05/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 407203 Date: 09/05/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/05/2017: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 407203 Date: 09/05/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 09/05/2017; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM (ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(DUPLICATE) DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS A DEFAULT HAS ALREADY BEEN ENTERED; SEE DOCKET ENTRY BELOW - CMW 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketATTORNEY JONATHAN SINGER SUBMITTED PAPER FILING WITHOUT COURT AUTHORIZATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ENTERED 11/28/2017/CMW ; AS TO: BETTYE MILES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 10/3/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; BETTYE MILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 407203; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: BETTYE MILES; Receipt: 407203 Date: 09/05/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 407203 Date: 09/05/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Troy Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISSMAN, RICHARD