Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:06:38 (UTC).

TILLMAN, ALESIA O -vs- TURNER JR., REGINALD A

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 TILLMAN, ALESIA O filed an Other lawsuit against TURNER JR , REGINALD A. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0961

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TILLMAN, ALESIA O

Gainesville, FL 32641

Defendant

TURNER JR., REGINALD A

Gainesville, FL 32641

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

03/26/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

DEFAULT (FOR POSSESSION ONLY) ENTERED 3/29/2021 AS TO; REGINALD A TURNER JR (DEFENDANT);

03/26/2021: DEFAULT (FOR POSSESSION ONLY) ENTERED 3/29/2021 AS TO; REGINALD A TURNER JR (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/23/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICTION SUMMONS (PERSONAL SERVICE) - 03/19/2021

03/18/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICTION SUMMONS (PERSONAL SERVICE) - 03/19/2021

SUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING AS TO REGINALD A TURNER JR (RTN TO PL- 03/17/2021-CAC)(SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

03/17/2021: SUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING AS TO REGINALD A TURNER JR (RTN TO PL- 03/17/2021-CAC)(SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

03/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR DISTRESS OR DETAINER-UP TO $15,000.00; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: COMPLAINT FOR DISTRESS OR DETAINER-UP TO $15,000.00; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

03/17/2021: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT (FOR POSSESSION ONLY) ENTERED 3/29/2021 AS TO; REGINALD A TURNER JR (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICTION SUMMONS (PERSONAL SERVICE) - 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 03/18/2021 ; For: TILLMAN, ALESIA O ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $310.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING AS TO REGINALD A TURNER JR (RTN TO PL- 03/17/2021-CAC)(SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DISTRESS OR DETAINER-UP TO $15,000.00; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less