This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 09/07/2021 at 16:16:12 (UTC).

THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA -vs- HOPE, MARY M et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA filed an Other lawsuit against HOPE, MARY M. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2703

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA

Defendants

HOPE, MARY M

Hawthorne, FL 32640

HOPE, FLETCHER J

Hawthorne, FL 32640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDEMAN ESQ, ROBERT J

5104 South Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES $15,001 TO $30,000 Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/10/2021: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES $15,001 TO $30,000 Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

08/10/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/10/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); FLETCHER J HOPE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/10/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); FLETCHER J HOPE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); MARY M HOPE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/10/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); MARY M HOPE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED ; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE SUMMONS DOES NOT CONTAIN THE TRILINGUAL TRANSLATION OF ADA CLAUSE);

08/18/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED ; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE SUMMONS DOES NOT CONTAIN THE TRILINGUAL TRANSLATION OF ADA CLAUSE);

SUMMONS UNISSUED ; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE SUMMONS DOES NOT CONTAIN THE TRILINGUAL TRANSLATION OF ADA CLAUSE); (CORRECT SUMMONS FORM EMAILED TO ATTORNEY)

08/18/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED ; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE SUMMONS DOES NOT CONTAIN THE TRILINGUAL TRANSLATION OF ADA CLAUSE); (CORRECT SUMMONS FORM EMAILED TO ATTORNEY)

SUMMONS - ISSUED; MARY M HOPE (DEFENDANT);

08/19/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED; MARY M HOPE (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS - ISSUED; FLETCHER J HOPE (DEFENDANT);

08/19/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED; FLETCHER J HOPE (DEFENDANT);

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; FLETCHER J HOPE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; MARY M HOPE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED ; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE SUMMONS DOES NOT CONTAIN THE TRILINGUAL TRANSLATION OF ADA CLAUSE); (CORRECT SUMMONS FORM EMAILED TO ATTORNEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED ; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE SUMMONS DOES NOT CONTAIN THE TRILINGUAL TRANSLATION OF ADA CLAUSE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 473560; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); MARY M HOPE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); FLETCHER J HOPE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES $15,001 TO $30,000 Receipt: 473560 Date: 08/11/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT J LINDEMAN, ESQ