This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 10/16/2021 at 16:39:14 (UTC).

TERRY, CYNTHIA O et al -VS- GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 TERRY, CYNTHIA O filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2663

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERRY, CYNTHIA O

TERRY, GARY L

Defendant

GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, Service Of Process Section

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTUS ESQ, COREY B

Attorney at THE NATION LAW FIRM

The Nation Law Firm, 570 Crown Oak Centre Dr

Longwood, FL 32750

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

09/24/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

09/23/2021: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 475182 Date: 09/20/2021; GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 475182 Date: 09/20/2021; GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

09/17/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 475182 Date: 09/20/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/17/2021: COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 475182 Date: 09/20/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/17/2021: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

09/17/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/17/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

09/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/17/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 09/17/2021; Disposition: B. HRG OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 475182; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 475182 Date: 09/20/2021; GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 475182 Date: 09/20/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justus, Corey Bryan