This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/29/2023 at 14:52:05 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA -VS- KIRK, JANE Y

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIRK, JANE Y. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4201

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

Defendant

KIRK, JANE Y

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTERO ESQ, ANDRES

1133 S. University Drive, 2Nd Floor

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

11/10/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

(UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493248 Date: 11/10/2022 (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 7.322, FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULES. PLEASE SEE CLERK WEBSITE UNDER SMALL CLAIMS SECTION FOR

11/10/2022: (UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493248 Date: 11/10/2022 (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 7.322, FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULES. PLEASE SEE CLERK WEBSITE UNDER SMALL CLAIMS SECTION FOR

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/10/2022: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT; Receipt: 493248 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: (E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT; Receipt: 493248 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

11/21/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

01/13/2023: COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

01/17/2023: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 04/28/2023 Time: 11:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/13/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493248; Paid: 493248; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493248 Date: 11/10/2022 (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 7.322, FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULES. PLEASE SEE CLERK WEBSITE UNDER SMALL CLAIMS SECTION FOR UPDATED SUMMONS); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT; Receipt: 493248 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTERO , ANDRES