This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2022 at 23:10:21 (UTC).

TAYLOR, RICHARD et al -vs- CARPINO LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 TAYLOR, RICHARD filed an Other lawsuit against CARPINO LLC. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2890

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAYLOR, RICHARD

TAYLOR, BEVERLY

Defendant

CARPINO LLC

C/O Luciana B Carraro, R.A., 1577 Bay Rd #203

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLER ESQ, THOMAS R

18731 Nw Us Highway 441

High Springs, FL 32643

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 474114 Date: 08/24/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/23/2021: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 474114 Date: 08/24/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

08/23/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARPINO LLC; Receipt: 474114 Date: 08/24/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/23/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARPINO LLC; Receipt: 474114 Date: 08/24/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS -SUBSTITUTE SERVE 10/5/2021

10/15/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS -SUBSTITUTE SERVE 10/5/2021

ANSWER

11/04/2021: ANSWER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/12/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

01/21/2022: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS -SUBSTITUTE SERVE 10/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 474114; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARPINO LLC; Receipt: 474114 Date: 08/24/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 474114 Date: 08/24/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLER, THOMAS RAY