Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:09:03 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK -VS- RICHARDSON, MARY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHARDSON, MARY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1265

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

RICHARDSON, MARY

Micanopy, FL 32667

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD ESQ, IASIA B

100 Second Avenue South, Suite 306S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorney

WELLS ESQ, MARILYN G

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF MARILYN G WELLS, PLLC

The Law Office Of Marilyn G Wells, Pllc, 2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

04/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 4/21/2021

04/22/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 4/21/2021

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/20/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 468505 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 468505 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 468505 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 468505 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/12/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 4/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468505; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/21/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 468505 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 468505 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS , MARILYN G