This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 16:26:17 (UTC).

STEWART, SAL et al -VS- FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION INC et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 STEWART, SAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1560

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEWART, SAL

FRIERSON, GILBERT

Defendant

FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUIZ ESQ, JOHN H

2701 S Le Jeune Road 10Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

MENA, MICHAEL O

2701 S. Le Jeune Rd., 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

IRELAND JR, LEONARD E

18 Nw 33Rd Ct

Gainesville, FL 32607

 

Court Documents

LETTER REGARDING TRANSFER CASE RECEIVED ; (MAILED TO ALL PARTIES 6/3/2022/CMW)

06/03/2022: LETTER REGARDING TRANSFER CASE RECEIVED ; (MAILED TO ALL PARTIES 6/3/2022/CMW)

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE ; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

05/23/2022: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE ; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET

05/23/2022: CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; LETTER; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

05/19/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; LETTER; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF APPEAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

05/06/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF APPEAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; TRANSFER LETTER; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

05/04/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; TRANSFER LETTER; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT ; ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION AND REMOVING CASE FROM THIS COURT'S DOCKET FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

05/02/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT ; ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION AND REMOVING CASE FROM THIS COURT'S DOCKET FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, ABATE OR TRANSFER TO PROPER VENUE FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

04/15/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, ABATE OR TRANSFER TO PROPER VENUE FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ; STATUS CONFERENCE FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

04/14/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ; STATUS CONFERENCE FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ZOOM / VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

04/14/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ZOOM / VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT ; REQUEST FOR SPECIAL SET HEARING BEFORE JUDGE PEDRO P ECHARTE, JR FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

04/13/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT ; REQUEST FOR SPECIAL SET HEARING BEFORE JUDGE PEDRO P ECHARTE, JR FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

04/13/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; TRANSFER ORDER ON RECUSAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

03/31/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; TRANSFER ORDER ON RECUSAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SAL STEWART'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

03/31/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SAL STEWART'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

03/30/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF HEARING; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

03/29/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF HEARING; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

03/28/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ORDER OF RECUSAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

03/22/2022: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ORDER OF RECUSAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER REGARDING TRANSFER CASE RECEIVED ; (MAILED TO ALL PARTIES 6/3/2022/CMW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 485727; Paid: 485727; Applied: $401.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $401.00; Total Fee Paid: $401.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE ; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; LETTER; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; NOTICE OF APPEAL; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; TRANSFER LETTER; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT ; ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION AND REMOVING CASE FROM THIS COURT'S DOCKET FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ISSUED SUMMONS AS TO THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF STATE HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATIONS FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ISSUED SUMMONS AS TO THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETICS ASSOCIATION FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; ISSUED SUMMONS AS TO FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION INC FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; UNISSUED SUMMONS AS TO THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF STATE HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATIONS FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; UNISSUED SUMMONS AS TO THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; UNISSUED SUMMONS AS TO FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION INC FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFORFEIT FS 28.244 Receipt: 485727 Date: 05/26/2022; Amount: $1.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT; CLASS COMPLAINT FOR ; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DAMAGES Receipt: 485727 Date: 05/26/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida High School Athletic Association is a litigant