This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 16:12:10 (UTC).

SRIDAT PERSAUD -VS- SPRINGSTEAD LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 SRIDAT PERSAUD filed an Other lawsuit against SPRINGSTEAD LLC. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1211

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SRIDAT PERSAUD

Defendants

SPRINGSTEAD LLC

R/A John R Pearce, 714 Nw 36Th Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32609

PEARCE, JOHN ROBERT

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STINSON ESQ, LANDON D

2233 Nw 41St St Ppl700-G

Gainesville, FL 32606

Defendant Attorney

THERRELL ESQ, KENDRA B

Kbuicki Draper, 76 S Laura St Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/19/2022: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

04/19/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

04/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

04/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

04/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

04/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

04/19/2022: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

04/19/2022: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; JOHN ROBERT PEARCE (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; JOHN ROBERT PEARCE (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; SPRINGSTEAD LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; SPRINGSTEAD LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 5/4/2022; JOHN ROBERT PEARCE (DEFENDANT);

05/06/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 5/4/2022; JOHN ROBERT PEARCE (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 5/4/2022; SPRINGSTEAD LLC (DEFENDANT);

05/06/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 5/4/2022; SPRINGSTEAD LLC (DEFENDANT);

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; MATTHEW BOTHWELL, ESQ OBO DEFENDANTS; ; ; ; (REOPEN)

05/17/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; MATTHEW BOTHWELL, ESQ OBO DEFENDANTS; ; ; ; (REOPEN)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; MATTHEW BOTHWELL, ESQ OBO DEFENDANTS; ; ; ; (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 5/4/2022; SPRINGSTEAD LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 5/4/2022; JOHN ROBERT PEARCE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 484158; Paid: 484158; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; SPRINGSTEAD LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; JOHN ROBERT PEARCE (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOHN ROBERT PEARCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SPRINGSTEAD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 484158 Date: 04/22/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THERRELL, KENDRA