This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 16:34:04 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC - VS - REINFELD, NORA J et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC - filed an Other lawsuit against - REINFELD, NORA J. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, KATHERINE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1424

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, KATHERINE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

REINFELD, NORA J

Gainesville, FL 32653

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORA J REINFELD

Gainesville, FL 32653

REINFELD, NORA

GRIFFIS DRILLING SPECIALISTS INC

C/O Stanley H Griffis, Jr Or Anyone Authorized To, Accept Service

Alachua, FL 32615

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

C/O P. Michael Patterson, Us Attorney, Northern District

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT ESQ, JENNIFER M

1505 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORA J REINFELD (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORA J REINFELD (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

05/23/2022: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

05/23/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; NORA J REINFELD (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; NORA J REINFELD (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER (CLERK DOES NOT FORWARD PROPOSED ORDERS TO THE COURT. PLAINTIFF MUST SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS DIRECTLY TO JUDGE PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - CMW 5/11/2022);

05/10/2022: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER (CLERK DOES NOT FORWARD PROPOSED ORDERS TO THE COURT. PLAINTIFF MUST SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS DIRECTLY TO JUDGE PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - CMW 5/11/2022);

SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO).

05/10/2022: SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO).

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ; GRIFFIS DRILLING SPECIALISTS, INC; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/10/2022: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ; GRIFFIS DRILLING SPECIALISTS, INC; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(a), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (CORPORATE SUMMONS); GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON CORPORATION OR COMPANY; WHEN S

05/10/2022: SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(a), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (CORPORATE SUMMONS); GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON CORPORATION OR COMPANY; WHEN S

SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO).

05/10/2022: SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO).

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR ; MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

05/10/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR ; MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

05/10/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingFORECLOSURE HEARING GM; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: FORECLOSURE HEARING GM ; Date: 09/23/2022 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L Location: COURTROOM 3-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 485193; Paid: 485193; Applied: $30.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORA J REINFELD (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; NORA J REINFELD (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 485193 Date: 05/16/2022; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $2,057.00; Total Fee Paid: $2,057.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 484999; Paid: 484999; Applied: $2,027.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO). ALSO THE LAST SENTENCE OF THE ADA LANGUAGE IN ENGLISH NEEDDS TO BE REMOVED. FOR CORRECT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE); WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 5/11/2022); ; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR ; MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES OF LIS PENDENS ; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $4.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS ; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketINDEX FEE FOR LIS PENDENS OVER 4 PARTIES ; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $3.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE ; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE; Receipt: 484999 Date: 05/11/2022; Amount: $1,905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Jennifer Mouser