This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 07:05:44 (UTC).

SMITH, KIMBERLY et al -VS- BARBER, DANA LEIGH et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 SMITH, KIMBERLY filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against BARBER, DANA LEIGH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0051

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SMITH, MICHAEL

SMITH, KIMBERLY

Respondents

ADDISON, PAUL ALLEN

Newberry, FL 32669

BARBER, DANA LEIGH

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NGUYEN ESQ, MICHELLE T

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW PA

Attorney At Law Pa, 900 North Palafox Street

Pensacola, FL 32501

Respondent Attorney

PEREZ-MCMILLEN ESQ, MONICA

101 Nw 75Th St, Suite 1

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketWITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT(REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL ; SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; 8/17/2021 @ 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ON STATUS CONFERENCE, MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION IN LIMINE, MOTION FOR TESTIMONY OF MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 5/3/2021 @ 2:00 PM (BY ZOOM) - ON PETITIONERS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; MOTION IN LIMINE & MOTION FOR TESTIMONY OF MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; DANA LEIGH BARBER (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE; MAY 3, 2021 @ 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketORDER ON EX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF MINOR BY EXTENDED FAMILY AND ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $440.00; Total Fee Paid: $440.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 464531; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF MINOR BY EXTENDED FAMILY (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT AND ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; MICHELLE T NGUYEN ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of KIMBERLY SMITH, MICHAEL SMITH (PETITIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY Receipt: 464531 Date: 01/08/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less