This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/05/2022 at 06:01:43 (UTC).

SIMEDHEALTH LLC -VS- JACKSON M.D., MARK F

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 SIMEDHEALTH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JACKSON M D , MARK F. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2594

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMEDHEALTH LLC

Defendant

JACKSON M.D., MARK F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDS ESQ, DARRYL R

 

Court Documents

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM- 11/29/21

12/06/2021: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM- 11/29/21

FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

11/30/2021: FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 11/03/2021 SERVED PERSONAL SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDAN MARK F JACKSON MD

11/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 11/03/2021 SERVED PERSONAL SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDAN MARK F JACKSON MD

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MARK F JACKSON MD

11/09/2021: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MARK F JACKSON MD

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

11/01/2021: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

EXHIBITS

10/29/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

10/29/2021: EXHIBITS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/29/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

EXHIBITS

10/29/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

10/29/2021: EXHIBITS

CLERK'S DEFAULT ISSUED 10/21/2021 ; AS TO MARK F JACKSON, MD / CMW

10/19/2021: CLERK'S DEFAULT ISSUED 10/21/2021 ; AS TO MARK F JACKSON, MD / CMW

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

10/19/2021: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

20 DAY SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES

09/14/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES

SHERIFF'S RETURN 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 09/28/2021

10/05/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 09/28/2021

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MARK F JACKSON, M.D.

10/05/2021: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MARK F JACKSON, M.D.

SUMMONS ISSUED; MARK F JACKSON MD (DEFENDANT);

09/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED; MARK F JACKSON MD (DEFENDANT);

EXHIBITS

09/14/2021: EXHIBITS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketFOR CORRECTION ON SRS ONLY-CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM- 11/29/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 09/14/2021; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 11/03/2021 SERVED PERSONAL SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDAN MARK F JACKSON MD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MARK F JACKSON MD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MARK F JACKSON, M.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 474995; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; MARK F JACKSON MD (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO) FOR CORRECT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE); WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE ; "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 9/15/2021); ; Receipt: 474995 Date: 09/15/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 474995 Date: 09/15/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less