Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/07/2020 at 22:21:51 (UTC).

SILVA, MARIA A -VS- TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 SILVA, MARIA A filed an Other lawsuit against TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0420

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVA, MARIA A

Defendants

GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP

C/O Corporation Service Company Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC

TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA

C/O Corporation Service Company Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARNER ESQ, D MARC

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 5200 Sw 91 Terr Ste 101

Gainesville, FL 32608

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/24/2019: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DIMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/14/2019: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DIMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

07/31/2019: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

07/31/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

07/01/2019: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE; 12/17/19 @ 11:30AM

05/23/2019: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE; 12/17/19 @ 11:30AM

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

05/23/2019: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

PLAINTIFF'S/PETITIONER'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

05/10/2019: PLAINTIFF'S/PETITIONER'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

08/02/2018: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE

06/15/2018: ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING

06/15/2018: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

03/15/2018: DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

03/15/2018: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC (DEFENDANT);

03/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP (DEFENDANT);

03/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 414565 Date: 02/14/2018; TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC, TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/13/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 414565 Date: 02/14/2018; TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC, TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 414565 Date: 02/14/2018; GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP, TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/13/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 414565 Date: 02/14/2018; GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP, TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/07/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DispositionNEG. - NURSING HOME NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 02/07/2018; Disposition: B. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DIMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE; 12/17/19 @ 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 414565; Paid: $20.00; Applied: $20.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 414565 Date: 02/14/2018; TERRACE HEALTH NH, LLC, TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 414565 Date: 02/14/2018; GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP, TERRACE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER A FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 414215; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 414215 Date: 02/07/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREYSTONE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D MARC WARNER