This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:00:03 (UTC).

SHARP, JAMES et al -vs- PARKER, WAYNE A

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 SHARP, JAMES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PARKER, WAYNE A. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1608

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHARP, JAMES

SHARP, CATHLEEN

Defendant

PARKER, WAYNE A

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLER, THOMAS R

18731 Nw Us Hwy 441

High Springs, FL 32643

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/11/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND OTHER RELIEF; Receipt: 469720 Date: 05/13/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/11/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND OTHER RELIEF; Receipt: 469720 Date: 05/13/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

06/25/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE ADA LANGUAGE IS INCORRECT & MUST BE TRANSLATED IN ALL (3) LANGUAGES; TO FIND THE NEW LANDLORD TENANT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE; CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "LANDLORD TENANT" THEN "LANDLORD TENANT EVICTION

05/11/2021: SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE ADA LANGUAGE IS INCORRECT & MUST BE TRANSLATED IN ALL (3) LANGUAGES; TO FIND THE NEW LANDLORD TENANT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE; CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "LANDLORD TENANT" THEN "LANDLORD TENANT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/12/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 469720; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE ADA LANGUAGE IS INCORRECT & MUST BE TRANSLATED IN ALL (3) LANGUAGES; TO FIND THE NEW LANDLORD TENANT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE; CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "LANDLORD TENANT" THEN "LANDLORD TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS FORM"; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 5/13/2021); ; Receipt: 469720 Date: 05/13/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND OTHER RELIEF; Receipt: 469720 Date: 05/13/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLER, THOMAS RAY