This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/13/2022 at 16:35:27 (UTC).

SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY -VS- TAYLOR COTTON RIDLEY INC

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAYLOR COTTON RIDLEY INC. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2110

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TAYLOR COTTON RIDLEY INC

C/O James L Ridley, Jr, R.A., 4410 Sw 35Th Ter

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOUDERMILK ESQ, RICHARD S

1800 Second St Ste 717

Sarasota, FL 34236

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 486541 Date: 06/15/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/14/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 486541 Date: 06/15/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

06/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON + VIEW SM

06/14/2022: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON + VIEW SM

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

06/16/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVERS

06/17/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVERS

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/27/2022: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 6/28/2022; TAYLOR COTTON RIDLEY INC (DEFENDANT);

07/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 6/28/2022; TAYLOR COTTON RIDLEY INC (DEFENDANT);

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 6/28/2022; TAYLOR COTTON RIDLEY INC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 08/12/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 486541; Paid: 486541; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS INCORRECT; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS", THEN CLICK ON THE LINK & ON THE NEXT PAGE SCROLL DOWN & CLICK ON + VIEW SMALL CLAIMS FORMS HERE THEN "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS $10 FEE HAS BEEN PAID CMW 6/15/2022); ; Receipt: 486541 Date: 06/15/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 486541 Date: 06/15/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUDERMILK RICHARD STEPHEN